Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Hamer, Howard Thomas (CPSO#: 29130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2944
Fax: (416) 785-4234
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Toronto Hospital - Western Site
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2X3
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard Hamer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hamer ( CPSO# 29130 )

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5185

Business Address:
1551 Weston Road
York ON  M6M 4Y4
Phone Number: (416) 246-6692

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 592-4513

Business Address:
800 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 207-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD THOMAS HAMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977