Hamilton, Julia Elizabeth (CPSO#: 84661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sports Medicine Specialists
150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M4P 1E8
Phone: (416) 481-1601
Fax: (416) 481-1267
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Devonshire Place
4th floor
Toronto ON  M5S2C9
Canada
Phone: 416-978-4678
Fax: 416-971-2846
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA ELIZABETH HAMILTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMILTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2009