Hamm, Caroline Marie (CPSO#: 66375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 255-8675
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hamm ( CPSO# 66375 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 253-5253

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE HAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expiry date attached to Certificate of Registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1994