Hammond, Jo-Anne Marie Smithers (CPSO#: 53884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Names: Smithers, Jo-Anne Marie (used until: 08 Jul 1987 )     Smithers Hammond, Jo-Anne Marie (used until: 28 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Thompson Rd
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jo-Anne Hammond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hammond ( CPSO# 53884 )

Business Address:
130 Thompson Road
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 601-8621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JO-ANNE MARIE SMITHERS HAMMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1985