Hamoudi, Aseel Zuhair (CPSO#: 80904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 main street west , HSC 2F
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: (905) 577-0471
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aseel Hamoudi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hamoudi ( CPSO# 80904 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
HSC 2F
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASEEL ZUHAIR HAMOUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMOUDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011