Hanbidge, Anthony Edward (CPSO#: 63102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
New East Wing
3 M C 426
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 3761
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 918 3Rd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 562 5th floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
Suite 1C-546
585 University Avenue, NCSB
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-6400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Anthony E. Hanbidge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )

Business Address:
562 - 600 University Avenue
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
1C-546 - 585 University Avenue
NCBS
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Division Hospital
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor, Fell Pavilion
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
918 - 610 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Corporation Name: L.M. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. White ( CPSO# 60766 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY EDWARD HANBIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANBIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1994