Haney, Marie Marthe Isabel (CPSO#: 64790)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
3950 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 0A9
Phone: (905) 305-1700
Fax: (905) 305-1706
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Lee & Dr. I. Haney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Haney ( CPSO# 64790 )
Dr. K. Lee ( CPSO# 60952 )

Business Address:
105 - 3950 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 305-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE MARTHE ISABEL HANEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1994