Hankinson, Keith Campbell (CPSO#: 58600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Two Rivers Family Health Team Inc
Hespeler Clinic
Unit 12
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone: (519) 629-4615 Ext. 224
Fax: (519) 629-4630
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Hankinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hankinson ( CPSO# 58600 )

Business Address:
12 - 350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH CAMPBELL HANKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANKINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988