Hanna, Michelle Rosalie (CPSO#: 100626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone: (647) 748-5663
Fax: (647) 740-7166
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Dewside Drive
Unit 206
Brampton ON  L6R0X5
Canada
Phone: 9057903535
Fax: 9057936556
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

7990 Kennedy Rd S
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 270-5662
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hanna ( CPSO# 100626)

Business Address:
Unit 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 455-5545

Business Address:
103 - 18 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z8
Phone Number: (647) 748-5663

Business Address:
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2W7

Business Address:
206 - 2 Dewside Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0X5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE ROSALIE HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015