Hanna, Samer Kamal Fahim (CPSO#: 74809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 595-4970
Fax: (905) 595-4980
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samer Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hanna ( CPSO# 74809 )

Business Address:
Suite 48
2140 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 595-4970

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMER KAMAL FAHIM HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005