Hanna Sarsam, Haithem Salem (CPSO#: 80584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2,3 and 4
1821 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 0H6
Phone: (905) 335-5959
Fax: (905) 335-4757
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Hanna Sarsam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hanna Sarsam ( CPSO# 80584 )

Business Address:
Suite 2, 3 and 4
1821 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 0H6
Phone Number: (905) 335-5959

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAITHEM SALEM HANNA SARSAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA SARSAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2004

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 1, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 15, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Dr. Hanna Sarsam has completed all components of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)