Hannam, Thomas Gordon (CPSO#: 69460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hannam Fertility Centre
15Th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone: (416) 595-1521
Fax: (416) 506-0680
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas Hannam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hannam ( CPSO# 69460 )

Business Address:
Hannam Fertility Centre
15th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Phone Number: (416) 595-1521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON HANNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 04 Sep 2000 to 29 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Sep 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2001