Haque, Andalib Faizah (CPSO#: 101384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen West Community Health Centre
168 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5V2R4
Phone: 416-703-8480
Fax: 416-703-8479
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Runnymede Walk-In Medical Clinic
2213 Bloor St W
2nd Floor, Unit 208
Toronto ON  M6S1N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 800-9697
Fax: (416) 695-2622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDALIB FAIZAH HAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015