Harfa, Leah (CPSO#: 64452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Monash University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Division
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8133
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge hospital
Centenary site
2867 Ellesmere rd.
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416 284 8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leah Harfa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Harfa ( CPSO# 64452 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital - Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEAH HARFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997