Harle, Christopher Coswald (CPSO#: 81870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Stellenbosch, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Dept of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3270
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dentistry Surgical Care Unit
Schulich Medicine & Dentistry
Western University
London
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3451
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Harle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Harle ( CPSO# 81870 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
LHSC - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 630-1337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Sep 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Christopher Coswald Harle may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Anaesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, University of
                        Western Ontario, in  which Dr. Harle holds a geographical full-time
                        teaching  or  research  appointment   at   the  rank  of  Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research  requirements of
                        his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate will automatically expire when Dr. Harle no  longer holds
                  the appointment, referred to in clause 1.