Harman, Gavin James Scott (CPSO#: 86424)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northgate Square
Suite 208
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone: (705) 476-7737
Fax: (705) 476-7177
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gavin Harman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Harman ( CPSO# 86424 )
Dr. L. Harman ( CPSO# 90674 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
Northgate Square
Suite 208
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone Number: (705) 476-7737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVIN JAMES SCOTT HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2012 to 31 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013