Harman, Lisa Michelle (CPSO#: 90674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Dahl, Lisa Michelle (used until: 01 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Center
Emergency Department
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

681 Commercial Street
North Bay ON  P1B 4E7
Canada
Phone: (705) 474-1400
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gavin Harman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Harman ( CPSO# 86424 )
Dr. L. Harman ( CPSO# 90674 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Phone Number: (705) 753-3110

Business Address:
Northgate Square
Suite 208
1500 Fisher Street
North Bay ON  P1B 2H3
Phone Number: (705) 476-7737

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE HARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012