Harmantas, Nikolaos (CPSO#: 72780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1200
251 Consumers Road
North York ON  M2J 4R3
Phone: (416) 572-8600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Harmantas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Harmantas ( CPSO# 72780 )

Business Address:
1200 - 251 Consumers Road
North York ON  M2J 4R3
Phone Number: (416) 572-8600

Business Address:
Suite 101
1013 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1G1

Business Address:
601 Rountree Dairy Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 5T8

Business Address:
Suite 105
4 Director Court
Woodbridge ON  L4L 3Z5

Business Address:
Suite 335
5945 Airport Road
Mississauga ON  L4V 1K9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIKOLAOS HARMANTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMANTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000