Harmathy, Tibor Andras (CPSO#: 50683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 125
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone: (705) 326-5565
Fax: (705) 329-2582
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harmathy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harmathy ( CPSO# 50683 )

Business Address:
Suite 125
210 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 7V1
Phone Number: (705) 326-5565

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIBOR ANDRAS HARMATHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMATHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984