Harper, William Louis (CPSO#: 70315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 513
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 540-3560
Fax: (905) 577-1404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.L. Harper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Harper ( CPSO# 70315 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic, Room 627
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 540-3560

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM LOUIS HARPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000