Harricharan, Rajendra (CPSO#: 60214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Utkal University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6604
Fax: (519) 667-6689
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dearness Home
710 Southdale Road
London ON  N6E 1R8
Canada
Phone: (519) 661-0400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rajendra Harricharan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Harricharan ( CPSO# 60214 )
Dr. M. Harricharan ( CPSO# 108008)

Business Address:
LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite A2 - 632
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6604

Business Address:
Dearness Home
710 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 641-0600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJENDRA HARRICHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRICHARAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1993