Harrison, Megan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 77594)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2571
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Megan E. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Harrison ( CPSO# 77594 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEGAN ELIZABETH HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2006