Hart, Lawrence Errol (CPSO#: 50688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 608
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 529-9749
Fax: (905) 521-0098
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hart ( CPSO# 50688 )

Business Address:
Suite 608
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 529-9749

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 21 May 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ERROL HART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HART is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1986