Hart, Richard Steven (CPSO#: 66393)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016