Hartsburg, Cory John (CPSO#: 71572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 206
1 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-2280 Ext. 6
Fax: (705) 728-0033
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cory Hartsburg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hartsburg ( CPSO# 71572 )

Business Address:
206 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-9172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORY JOHN HARTSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTSBURG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002