Harvey, Marie-Andree (CPSO#: 69748)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6115
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sivilotti & Harvey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sivilotti ( CPSO# 68601 )
Dr. M. Harvey ( CPSO# 69748 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-ANDREE HARVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARVEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 1996 to 07 Mar 1996
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2000