Harwood, Robin Peter (CPSO#: 82815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 3630
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robin Harwood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Harwood ( CPSO# 82815 )

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN PETER HARWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARWOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010