Hastie, Ian Gordon (CPSO#: 22878)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian G. Hastie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Huntsville Memorial Hospital 100 Frank Miller Drive Huntsville, ON P1H 1H7
Date Received: 15 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015