Hawling, Christopher Andrew (CPSO#: 58263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 431-8133
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Rd.
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Centanary Site
2867 Ellesmere Rd.
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

71545 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2025 Midland Av
Toronto ON  M1P 3P2
Canada
Phone: (647) 341-3832
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-6160
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

605 McCowan Road
Toronto ON  M1J 1J9
Canada
Phone: (416) 439-1718
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Don Mills Surgical
Suite 208
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hawling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hawling ( CPSO# 58263 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3

Business Address:
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3P2

Business Address:
7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANDREW HAWLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWLING is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988