Hay, William John (CPSO#: 31330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Feb 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111 Ext. 52207
Fax: (613) 636-6175
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prescott-Russell Residence
1020 Cartier Blvd.
Hawkesbury, Ontario
K6A 1W7
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 1W7
Canada
Phone: 613632-2755
Fax: 613632-4056
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hay ( CPSO# 31330 )

Business Address:
Hawkesbury General Hospital
1111 Rue Ghislain
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3G5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN HAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1980