Haykal, Kay-Anne (CPSO#: 84917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
745 Montreal Road
unit 101B
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone: (613) 749-4429
Fax: (613) 749-7942
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kay-Anne Haykal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Haykal ( CPSO# 84917 )

Business Address:
Montfort Academic Family Health Team
101B - 745 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T1
Phone Number: (613) 749-4429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAY-ANNE HAYKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAYKAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009