Hazlett, Melinda May (CPSO#: 64230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone: (705) 721-1113
Fax: (705) 721-7815
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Hazlett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hazlett ( CPSO# 64230 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie ON  L4N 1L2
Phone Number: (705) 721-1113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA MAY HAZLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAZLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992