Heffernan, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 69137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300 1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 3
Fax: (905) 815-0299
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 340
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 3
Fax: (905) 815-0299
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: 905-849-4567
Fax: 905-815-0299
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Heffernan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heffernan ( CPSO# 69137 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Business Address:
409 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Business Address:
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2

Business Address:
Suite 300-1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 849-4567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999