Hegele, Robert Alexander (CPSO#: 50701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 4288-A
1151 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6A 5B7
Phone: (519) 931-5271
Fax: (519) 931-5218
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert A. Hegele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hegele ( CPSO# 50701 )

Business Address:
Room 4288-A
1151 Richmond Street North
London ON  N6A 5B7
Phone Number: (519) 931-5271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALEXANDER HEGELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGELE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988