Heggie, Jane Ellen (CPSO#: 56779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Heggie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Heggie ( CPSO# 56779 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
3 Eaton North
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3567

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELLEN HEGGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEGGIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Research Fellows - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987