Heitzner, Maureen Catherine (CPSO#: 60822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 405
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-2240
Fax: (905) 898-2253
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maureen Heitzner Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heitzner ( CPSO# 60822 )

Business Address:
531 Davis Drive
Suite 405
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-2240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN CATHERINE HEITZNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEITZNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990