Held, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 85615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Held Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Held ( CPSO# 85615 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
Markham Family Physicians
122 Cornell Park Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 471-7905

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN HELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2007