Hemans, Clover Althea (CPSO#: 59859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: Hemans-Osland, Clover Althea (used until: 14 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate Street
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Hemans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hemans ( CPSO# 59859 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate Street
Oakville ON  L6J 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLOVER ALTHEA HEMANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMANS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 May 1990 to 31 May 1990
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Jan 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 1991 to 31 Mar 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989