Hendy, Ramez Hendy Mikhail (CPSO#: 86886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Fax: (613) 930-4502
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Hendy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hendy ( CPSO# 86886 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMEZ HENDY MIKHAIL HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2009 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2011 to 14 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012