Henen, Raafat Naguib Ibrahim (CPSO#: 75345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203 - 1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone: (416) 284-0289
Fax: (416) 284-7590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Henen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Henen ( CPSO# 75345 )

Business Address:
203 - 1585 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1B 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 284-0289

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAAFAT NAGUIB IBRAHIM HENEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005