Henriques, Tania Ribeiro (CPSO#: 84743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite H
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone: (905) 681-7577
Fax: (905) 681-0855
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Henriques Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Henriques ( CPSO# 84743 )

Business Address:
Suite H
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington ON  L7N 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 681-7577

Business Address:
1612 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E6
Phone Number: (905) 529-5131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA RIBEIRO HENRIQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRIQUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011