Hepburn, Douglas Stuart (CPSO#: 57159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Fertility Centre
117 King Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3543
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Hepburn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hepburn ( CPSO# 57159 )

Business Address:
Durham Fertility Centre
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3543

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS STUART HEPBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEPBURN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 30 Mar 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1987