Herath, Subaratna Menike (CPSO#: 62929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ceylon, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3237
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Subaratna Herath Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herath ( CPSO# 62929 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUBARATNA MENIKE HERATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERATH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1993