Herman, Rebecca Cate (CPSO#: 80786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
503-1881 Yonge St.
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: 647-748-1881
Fax: 647-748-1882
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay Stree Centre for Birth Control
790 Bay Street
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3700
Fax: (416) 351-3727
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA CATE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 06 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2006