Herman, Stephanie Jane (CPSO#: 105980)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202- 9780 Bramalea Rd North
Brampton ON  L6S 2P1
Phone: 905- 791-2390
Fax: (905) 791-8476
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Dundas St East
Toronto ON  M5B 1C6
Canada
Phone: 416-361-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE JANE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017