Herrera Robles, Luis Carlos (CPSO#: 68294)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidad De Panama, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 521 2100
Fax: (905) 577 1498
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luis Carlos Herrera Robles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Herrera Robles ( CPSO# 68294 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
C753 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4037

Business Address:
7th Floor
720 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5V 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 963-9338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIS CARLOS HERRERA ROBLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRERA ROBLES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999