Hershler, Abby (CPSO#: 80683)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
7th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6230
Fax: (416) 323-6356
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nameres (Native Men's Residence)
14 Vaughan Road
Toronto ON  M6G 2N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 652-0334
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABBY HERSHLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009