Heslop, Winston Lloyd (CPSO#: 53261)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
31 Centre St South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone: (905) 455-3010
Fax: (905) 4553011
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W.L. Heslop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Heslop ( CPSO# 53261 )

Business Address:
31 Centre Street South
Brampton ON  L6W 2X7
Phone Number: (905) 455-3010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINSTON LLOYD HESLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESLOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1983
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2005