Hess, Allan Rae (CPSO#: 31772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
637 Davis Drive
Suite 100
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allan R. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hess ( CPSO# 31772 )

Business Address:
100 - 637 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 898-7924

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN RAE HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980