Hessian, Renee Cynthia (CPSO#: 57193)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (613) 761-4708
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee C. Hessian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hessian ( CPSO# 57193 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Room 11289A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4377

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE CYNTHIA HESSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESSIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1988